**Vedic Maths Tricks**

**Vedic Maths** is a collection of techniques /
formulas to solve mathematical arithmetic in an easy and fast way. **Vedic Maths
Tricks** can be applied for fast calculation of any multiplication problem. Here
some calculations of squaring and multiplication are given using **Vedic Maths
Tricks**.

Vedic Mathematics: Introduction

**Vedic Maths Tricks for Fast Calculation**

**1. Squaring a 2-digit Number Whose Unit Digit is 5**

To make the calculation faster, we use the tricks of
Vedic maths. Let us see how to find the square of a 2-digit number whose unit’s
digit is 5.

For example, let us calculate (75)².

Step 1. Multiply 75 × 75 = . . 25 (end terms)

Step 2. Take 7 × (7 + 1) = 56

So, the answer is 5625.

Now, you have understood the process, try to find
the squares of 65 and 45.

**2. Squaring any 2-digit Number**

Sometimes, we need to find the square of a 2-digit
number very quickly. If we do not have pen and paper, then we can find the square
of any 2-digit number mentally and quickly using the Vedic maths.

For example, let us calculate (46)².

Step 1. Find (6)² = 36. Write …6 (unit digit) and
take 3 as carry over.

Step 2. Multiply 4 × 6 × 2 (both digits and 2 for
square) = 48

Step 3. Add carry over 3, 48 + 3 = 51. Write 1 to the left of 6
as …16 (tens and ones digits) and 5 carry over.

Step 4. Find (4)² = 16. Add carry over 5, 16 + 5 =
21. Write 21 to the left of 16 to get the answer. So, the answer is 2116.

**3. Multiply a Number by 5**

We can multiply any number by 5 using a Vedic maths
tricks. To multiply an even number by 5, simply divide the number by 2 and then
add a 0 to the end of the quotient.

For example, 384 × 5 = 1920 (384/2 = 192, 192 and put 0 = 1920).

To multiply an odd number by 5, subtract 1 from the number,
divide it by 2, and add a 5 to the end of the result.

For example, 487 × 5 = 2435 (487 – 1 = 486, 486/2 = 243, 243 and
put 5 = 2435). Now, to check your understanding, try 1238 × 5 and 8743 × 5.

**4. Subtraction from 1000, 10000, 100000**

While subtracting from 1000s, it seems difficult. Vedic
maths tricks make it easier. To subtract a number from 100’s multiple such as
1000, 10000, etc. quickly, one can use the Vedic maths tricks. For example, to
subtract 1000 – 467, one could subtract each figure in 467 from 9 and then
subtract the last figure from 10.

Step 1. 9 – 4 = 5.

Step 2. 9 – 6 = 3.

Step 3. 10 – 7 = 3.

Thus, the answer is: (1000 – 467) = 533.

Now, practice the given sums using this technique.

1000 – 657, 10,000 – 1526, 10,000 – 5264, 1000 – 436.

**5. Multiplication of any 2-digit Numbers (11 – 19)**

One of the best Vedic maths tricks for
multiplication is to multiply any two-digit numbers from 11 to 19 quickly and
accurately.

Follow these steps to multiply numbers from 11 to 19:

Step 1: Add the unit digit of the smaller number to
the larger number.

Step 2: Multiply the result by 10.

Step 3: Multiply the unit digits of the numbers.

Step 4: Add the two numbers.

For example, to multiply 13 and 15, the steps are as
follows:

Step 1: 15 + 3 = 18.

Step 2: 18 × 10 = 180.

Step 3: 3 × 5 = 15.

Step 4: Add 180 + 15 = 195.

**Thus, the product of 13 and 15 is 195.**

**6. Dividing a Large Number by 5**

One of the best Vedic maths tricks is to divide a
large number by 5. We use the Vedic maths tricks for faster calculation of
dividing a large number by 5. Let us see the following example.

**Example 1:** Find the quotient of 62734/5.

Step 1: 62734 × 2 = 125468

Step 2: Put a decimal point after one digit from the
right: 12546.8

**Example 2:** Find the quotient of 47285/5.

Step 1: 47285 × 2 = 94570

Step 2: Put a decimal point after one digit from the
right: 9457.0 or 9457

**7. Multiply any 2-digit Number by 11**

One of the best Vedic maths tricks for fast
calculation is to multiply a 2-digit number by 11. For example, 45 × 11 = 495, 76
× 11 = 836, and 28 × 11 = 308 demonstrate how this method works.

Follow these steps to multiply 45 by 11:

Step 1: Put a zero (0) to the extreme right of 45 to get 450.

Step 2: Add 45 with this number, 45 + 450 = 495.

Thus, 45 × 11 = 495.

**8. Multiplication of any 3-digit Numbers**

Using Vedic maths tricks, we can multiply two
3-digit numbers very easily.

For example, let us multiply 808 and 206.

Step 1: Subtract the unit digit from the actual number.

808 – 8 = 800

206 – 6 = 200

Step 2: Select any number and add the unit digit of
the other number.

808 + 6 = 814

Step 3: Multiply the product of Step 2 and Step 1:
814 × 200 = 162800

Step 4: The unit’s digits of both the numbers are 8 and
6. The product of these two numbers are: 8 × 6 = 48

Step 5: Now, add 162800 + 48 = 162848

Therefore, 808 × 206 = 162848

**9. Conversion of Kilograms to Pounds**

We can convert kilograms into Pounds using Vedic
maths tricks very easily. Here is an example: Convert 148 kg to pounds.

Step 1: Double the kilogram value: 148 × 2 = 296

Step 2: Divide the result by 10. (296/10 = 29.6).

Step 3: Add the two numbers together: 296 + 29.6 = 325.6
Pounds

Thus, 148 kg =
325.6 Pounds

**Related Link:**