Multiplication Sums for Class 4

# Multiplication Sums for Class 4

## Multiplication Sums for Class 4

Multiplication sums for class 4 play a vital role in strengthening the maths concepts. After studying the concepts of mathematics, revision of questions related to that particular topic is very important for the students. This assesses the preparation of the students. Students can assess themselves by its own by solving the worksheets problems. Parents and teachers can also assess the students by giving them these worksheets to the students to solve.

Maths-formula brings such worksheets on Multiplication Class 4 for you. By solving these worksheets, you can increase the understanding of the concepts learnt. These worksheets are prepared by experienced teachers and subject matter experts.

Thus, let us try to attempt these questions to solve and assess yourself. Parents and teachers can also give these questions to the students to test them. Unit tests can also be prepared by the teachers using these questions.

## Multiplication Sums for Class 4

1. Fill in the boxes.

a. 50 + 50 + 50 + 50 + 50 = _____× 50

b. 34 + 34 + 34 + 34 + 34 = _____× 34

c. 52 + 52 + 52 + 52 + 52 + 52 + 52 + 52 +52 =_____ × 52

d. ____ + ____ + ____ + ____ + ____ + ____ = _____× 65

e. 253 + 253 + 253 + 253 + 253 + 253 =______ × 253

2. Fill in the blanks using the properties of multiplication.

a. 121 × 54 = ________ × 121

b. 83 × 751 = 751 × ________

c. 264 × 1 = ________

d. 823 × ________ = 823

e. 435 × 0 = ________

f. 450 × 34 = _____ × 450

g. 234 × 2 = ________

h. 623 × 1 = ________

i. 551 × 1 = ________

j. 323 × 0 = ________

3. Fill in the blanks.

a. 4 × 10 = _________

b. 6 × 10 = _________

c. 45 × 10 = _________

d. 196 × 10 = _________

e. 6 × 100 = _________

f. 5 × 100 = _________

g. 35 × 100 = _________

h. 950 × 100 = _________

i. 4 × 1000 = _________

j. 9 × 1000 = _________

k. 39 × 1000 = _________

l. 185 × 1000 = _________

4. Match the following:

a. 534 × 2                        i. is an odd number

b. 457 × 1                        ii. 0

c. 237 × 0                        iii. is an even number

d. product of 522 and 4     iv. 457

e. product of 311 and 9      v. 2 × 534

5. Fill in the blanks.

a. 9 × 13 = ___________

b. 7 × 14 = ___________

c. 6 × 15 = ___________

d. 5 × 17 = ___________

e. 8 × 13 = ___________

f. 4 × 19 = ___________

g. 3 × 17 = ___________

h. 2 × 15 = ___________

6. Find the product.

a. 11 × 100

b. 18 × 1000

c. 130 × 1000

d. 403 × 100

e. 2634 × 100

f. 110 × 100

g. 4 × 10,000

h. 73 × 1000

7. Multiply using multiplication tables.

a. 18 × 4 = ______

b. 16 × 5 = ______

c. 19 × 5 = ______

d. 12 × 7 = ______

e. 13 × 6 = ______

f. 11 × 5 = ______

g. 17 × 6 = ______

h. 14 × 9 = ______

i. 15 × 8 = ______

8. Find the product using smart multiplication.

a. 11× 99

b. 28 × 99

c. 65 × 99

d. 79 × 99

e. 36 × 99

f. 52 × 99

g. 41 × 99

h. 94 × 9

i. 15 × 49

j. 28 × 89

k. 34 × 39

l. 68 × 59

9. Multiply the following by using lattice algorithm.

a. 75 × 36

b. 84 × 35

c. 88 × 37

d. 396 × 26

e. 412 × 49

f. 284 × 27

g. 645 × 45

h. 374 × 37

i. 537 × 53

10. There are 235 marbles in a jar. How many marbles are there in 5 such jars?

11. If two children can sit on one bench, then how many children can sit on 24 benches?

12. A carton can hold 30 apples. How many apples will be there in 15 such cartons?

13. A goods train can carry 25 containers in one trip. Find the number of containers the train can carry in 12 trips.

14. Neha saves  1550 every month. How much does she save in 5 years?

15. A box of apples contains 248 apples. How many apples are there in 165 boxes?

16. There are 425 pages in a book. How many pages are there in 241 books with the same number of pages?

17. If 475 ice cream parlours in a city sold 682 ice creams each, how many ice creams were sold in all?

18. If Nisha pays ₹ 825 every month for her tuition classes, then how much will she pay for the whole year?

19. Estimate the product of 341 and 527 by rounding off the numbers to the nearest 10.

20. Estimate the product of 626 and 758 by rounding off the numbers to the nearest 100.

1. a. 5      b. 5     c. 9

d. 65 + 65 + 65 + 65 + 65 + 65 = 6 × 65

e. 6

2. a. 54      b. 83

c. 264     d. 1

e. 0         f. 34

g. 468     h. 623

i. 551       j. 0

3. a. 40        b. 60

c. 450      d. 1960

e. 600      f. 500

g. 3500     h. 95,000

i. 4000      j. 9000

k. 39000    l. 185000

4. a. (v)     b. (iv)

c. (ii)    d. (iii)    e. (i)

5. a. 117        b. 98

c. 90         d. 85

e. 104        f. 76

g. 51          h. 30

6. a. 1100      b. 18,000

c. 1,30,000   d. 40,300

e. 2,63,400   f. 11,000

g. 40,000      h. 73,000

7. a. 72       b. 80      c. 95

d. 84      e. 78       f. 55

g. 102     h. 126    i. 120

8. a. 1089        b. 2772

c. 6435        d. 7821

e. 3564        f. 5148

g. 4059        h. 849

i. 735           j. 2492

k. 1326        l. 4012

9. a. 2700       b. 2940

c. 3256        d. 10,296

e. 20,188     f. 7668

g. 29,025     h. 13,838

i. 28,461

10. 1175 marbles

11. 48 children

12. 450 apples

13. 300 containers

14. ₹ 7750

15. 40,920 apples

16. 1,02,425 pages

17. 3,23,950 ice creams

18. ₹ 9900

19. 1,80,200

20. 4,80,000

 Maths Worksheets for Class 4

 Maths Worksheets for Other Classes

Maths Worksheets for Class 1

Maths Worksheets for Class 2

Maths Worksheets for Class 3

Maths Worksheets for Class 5

Maths Worksheets for Class 6

Maths Worksheets for Class 7

Maths Worksheets for Class 8

Maths Worksheets for Class 9

Please do not enter any spam link in the comment box.