Maths Quiz for Class 4 Multiplication

# Maths Quiz for Class 4 Multiplication

## Maths Quiz for Class 4 Multiplication

Maths quiz for class 4 is created with mental maths questions to check the concept clarity of the students. In this post, you will find 20 online maths quiz questions for class 4 multiplication.

Question 1: 12 × 89 = _________
A) 1168
B) 1078
C) 1068
D) 1058
Explanation: 12 × 89 = 1068
Question 2: 24 × 57 = _________
A) 1368
B) 1378
C) 1358
D) 1268
Explanation: 24 × 57 = 1368
Question 3: 5745 × 6 = __________
A) 34,470
B) 34,460
C) 34,480
D) 34,370
Explanation: 5745 × 6 = 34,470
Question 4: The product of 3874 and 26 is _________.
A) 1,01,724
B) 1,00,724
C) 1,10,724
D) 1,00,624
Explanation: 3874 × 26 = 1,00,724
Question 5: The product of 2839 and 34 is _____.
A) 96,516
B) 96,526
C) 96,426
D) 95,526
Explanation: 2839 × 34 = 96,526
Question 6: 584 × 100 = ______
A) 584
B) 5840
C) 58,400
D) 5,84,000
Explanation: 584 × 100 = 58,400
Question 7: 275 × 1000 = ______
A) 27,50,000
B) 2,75,000
C) 27,500
D) 2750
Explanation: 275 × 1000 = 2,75,000
Question 8: 94 × 10,000 = ______
A) 940
B) 9400
C) 94,000
D) 9,40,000
Explanation: 94 × 10,000 = 9,40,000
Question 9: 8592 × 0 = _____
A) 0
B) 85920
C) 8592
D) 8590
Explanation: 8592 × 0 = 0
Question 10: 6174 × 1 = _____
A) 6175
B) 1
C) 6174
D) 61741
Explanation: 6174 × 1 = 6174
Question 11: 651 × 86 = 86 × ______
A) 86
B) 651
C) 55,986
D) 65,186
Explanation: 651 × 86 = 86 × 651
Question 12: 48 × 999 = ________
A) 47,958
B) 47,952
C) 47,954
D) 47,956
Explanation: 48 × 999 = 47,952
Question 13: Which of the following products is equal to 565 + 435?
A) 125 × 8
B) 120 × 8
C) 100 × 8
D) 150 × 8
Explanation: 125 × 8 = 1000 and 565 + 435 = 1000
Question 14: Which of the following products lies between 1000 and 2000?
A) 275 × 9
B) 136 × 21
C) 124 × 18
D) 136 × 12
Explanation: 136 × 12 = 1632 which is between 1000 and 2000.
Question 15: Which one of the following is correct?
A) 952 × 10 = 95,200
B) 86 × 100 = 860
C) 69 × 10,000 = 6,90,000
D) 37 × 1000 = 3700
Explanation: 69 × 10,000 = 6,90,000 is correct and others are wrong.
Question 16: 475 × 3 thousands = __________
A) 1,42,500
B) 14,25,000
C) 14,250
D) 1425
Explanation: 475 × 3 thousands = 475 × 3000 = 475 × 3 × 1000 = 14,25,000
Question 17: Hari has 3 bank accounts. If each bank account has ₹ 4538, then the total money in his 3 bank accounts is _________.
A) ₹ 13,614
B) ₹ 13,624
C) ₹ 13,514
D) ₹ 12,614
Explanation: ₹ 4538 × 3 = ₹ 13,614
Question 18: If a box contains 378 marbles, then how many marbles will be there in 15 such boxes?
A) 5570
B) 5680
C) 5670
D) 5660
Explanation: 378 × 15 = 5670
Question 19: A school has 364 students in each class. If there are 12 classes in the school, how many total students are there in the school?
A) 4358
B) 4368
C) 4378
D) 4278
Explanation: 364 × 12 = 4368
Question 20: There are 328 pages in a textbook. How many pages will be there in 258 such textbooks?
A) 84,524
B) 84,634
C) 84,624
D) 84,614
Explanation: 328 × 258 = 84,624

## Report Card

Total Questions Attempted: 0